Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/02/2021 at 13:12:06 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. Michael Le

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael Le. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3907

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

Le, Michael

Saginaw, TX 76131-4915

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN F GILLESPIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerGregory, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Le, Michael: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EFILING@PCPUSA.NET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-1412: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s) (PCP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILLESPIE JOHN F