Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 08:05:01 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Marina Henry

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marina Henry. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********63-3

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

a Foreign Limited Liability Company

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Defendants

or wherever the Defendant may be found

Fort Worth, TX 76140-3215

Henry, Marina

Fort Worth, TX 76140-3215

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Manasi Tulpule Tahiliani

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170058: Midland Credit Management, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Midland Credit Management, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to PCP 03/01/2021; Henry, Marina: Served: 03/09/2021; Returned: 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a Foreign Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tahiliani, Manasi