This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/22/2022 at 04:31:21 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs. Maria Guzman

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria Guzman. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0350

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Guzman, Maria

Fort Worth, TX 76111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : 03/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEmailed: SIGNED ORDER TO PPS//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: METHODS 1 AND 2/EMAIL TO PPS//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO PPS FOR SERVICE/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCITATION: AMENDED / EMAIL TO ABCLEGAL/HG; Guzman, Maria: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Citations Returned Unexecuted/EFILED/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed: Amended Petition & Cover Letter/EFILED/EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM//HG; Guzman, Maria: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-02054: Midland Credit Management Inc.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Midland Credit Management Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper