This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/02/2023 at 19:43:09 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs. Maria C. Butler

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria C Butler. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8564

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Butler, Maria C.

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID E KIRKENDALL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: ALT SVC 12/29/22 POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO ABC LEGAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-6018: Midland Credit Management Inc.: (37.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Midland Credit Management Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 58.00; Total Payments and Credits: 58.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 58.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Kirkendall