This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2023 at 13:03:52 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. MARGARET WILKERSON

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARGARET WILKERSON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9829

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

WILKERSON, MARGARET

Grapevine, TX 76051-5995

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party: HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCITATION: WILKERSON, MARGARET: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-00204: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): MIDLAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less