This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/03/2021 at 04:35:05 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. LAUREN VADER

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LAUREN VADER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9919

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

VADER, LAUREN

Fort Worth, TX 76137-3561

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Caviness

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : 01/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: RETURN OF SERVICE//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCITATION: PCP/KAC; VADER, LAUREN: Served: 11/02/2021; Returned: 11/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CIT AND PET TO PCP FOR SERVICE //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-00953: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: efiling@pcpusa.net //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID CAVINESS