Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 08:19:20 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Kevin J Parkins

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kevin J Parkins. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********87-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

,a Foreign Limited Liability Company

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Defendants

Or wherever the Defendant may be found

Fort Worth, TX 76110-1569

Parkins, Kevin J

Fort Worth, TX 76110-1569

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID CAVINESS

Defendant Attorney

James A. Foley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4: (Kevin J Parkins)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-169956: Midland Credit Management, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Midland Credit Management, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to PCP 02/25/2021; Parkins, Kevin J: Served: 03/05/2021; Returned: 03/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a Foreign Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James A. Foley