This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/22/2021 at 19:33:02 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. KEITH D MAYS

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KEITH D MAYS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6049

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

MAYS, KEITH D

Fort Worth, TX 76140-7527

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED CITN/PETN EFILING@PCPUSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCITATION: MAYS, KEITH D: Returned Unserved 11/01/2021; Returned: 11/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-07432: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Katharine Banks