This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/02/2021 at 10:31:45 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. JASMINE TUBBS

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASMINE TUBBS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7075

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

TUBBS, JASMINE

Euless, TX 76039-1887

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katharine Banks Allen

Juan Carlos Goenaga

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: EMAILED/MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. MEDIATION SET FOR 1/13/22 AT 1:00PM. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY DEFN VIA EMAIL. CASE TO BE SET FOR MEDIATION/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: LTR TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY PCP USA. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 10/27/21 @ 10:43AM BY PCP USA. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCITATION: TUBBS, JASMINE: Served: 10/27/2021; Returned: 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO PCP FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-05008: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): MIDLAND CREDIT MNGMT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan Goenaga

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Katharine Banks