This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/18/2022 at 15:43:26 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. James Turner

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against James Turner. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6619

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

Turner, James

Arlington, TX 76005-1149

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $1,702.93; Awarded To: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Awarded Against: James Turner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketProposed Order: PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO PCP; Turner, James: Served: 08/06/2022; Returned: 08/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2022-05962: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Katharine Banks