This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/11/2021 at 07:30:13 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. JAMAAL S WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMAAL S WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4718

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

WILLIAMS, JAMAAL S

Fort Worth, TX 76155

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-04668: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO EFILING@PCPUSA.NET; WILLIAMS, JAMAAL S: Served: 09/25/2021; Returned: 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Katharine Banks