This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/14/2022 at 10:02:35 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. JACQUIE D WILBORN

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JACQUIE D WILBORN. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7417

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

WILBORN, JACQUIE D

Euless, TX 76039-3865

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY PRO SE DEFN VIA FAX. PHONE NUMBER ADDED. CASE TO BE SET FOR MEDIATION/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketComments: DFNT HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE-UP OR FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN. COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): FROM PCP/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: DEFN SERVED IN PERSON ON 12-9-21 AT 2:49 PM BY PCP/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCITATION: WILBORN, JACQUIE D: Served: 12/09/2021; Returned: 12/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO PCP FOR SERVICE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-05775: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): MIDLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Katharine Banks