Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/22/2021 at 04:31:28 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. GREGORY SMITH

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GREGORY SMITH. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7822

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

SMITH, GREGORY

Hurst, TX 76053-4629

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN F GILLESPIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/Option Letter Sent: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) : 06/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: NON-SERVICE//EFILED//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-01567: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO PCPUSA//VA; SMITH, GREGORY: Returned Unserved 04/08/2021; Returned: 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//VA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: efiling@pcpusa.net //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILLESPIE JOHN F