Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/26/2021 at 22:38:46 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. GORDON TURNER

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GORDON TURNER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1556

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Po Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

TURNER, GORDON

Arlington, TX 76015-3430

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN F GILLESPIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • DocketCITATION: TURNER, GORDON: Served: 03/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO REQUESTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-02307: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EMAIL TO: midlandtx@abclegal.com HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILLESPIE JOHN F