This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/04/2022 at 14:11:38 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs. DEREK A BREWSTER

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEREK A BREWSTER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8568

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Defendant

BREWSTER, DEREK A

Fort Worth, TX 76244-4391

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Carlos Goenaga

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketComments: DFNT HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE-UP OR FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVED. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY EZ MESSENGER. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 6/27/22 @ 5:50PM BY EZ MESSENGER. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2022-02357: Midland Credit Management Inc.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Midland Credit Management Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCITATION: BREWSTER, DEREK A: Served: 06/27/2022; Returned: 06/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO EZ MESSENGER FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: 6178693 Brewster Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): MIDLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan Goenaga