This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/10/2021 at 04:00:34 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. CHUCK D WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHUCK D WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9765

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

WILLIAMS, CHUCK D

North Richland Hills, TX 76180-5386

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Caviness

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : 12/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCITATION: PCP/KAC; WILLIAMS, CHUCK D: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PCP//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-00634: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: efiling@pcpusa.net //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID CAVINESS