This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/29/2021 at 13:31:48 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs. Charlotte Olhausen

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Charlotte Olhausen. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5755

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Po Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

Olhausen, Charlotte

Fort Worth, TX 76179-7644

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Carlos Goenaga

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : answer due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Olhausen, Charlotte: Served: 10/25/2021; Returned: 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO MIDLANDTX@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-5630: Midland Credit Management Inc.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Midland Credit Management Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: MIDLANDTX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan Goenaga