This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/03/2023 at 05:10:23 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. CHARLES R STEWART

Case Summary

On 03/08/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARLES R STEWART. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0499

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

STEWART, CHARLES R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter S. Newman

Defendant Attorney

Michael W Weston

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: 90 DAYS; EMAILED BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketMotion For Continuance Filed: Agreed Motion for Continuance // 1ST REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Non-Jury Trial: FOR 5/25/23 EMAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCITATION: STEWART, CHARLES R: Served: 04/11/2023; Returned: 04/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer//BY ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2023-02928: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (54.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: to MidlandTX@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less