This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/16/2021 at 10:01:39 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. BRENDAN M BRADLEY

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRENDAN M BRADLEY. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6270

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

BRADLEY, BRENDAN M

Keller, TX 76248-3652

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due: (8:30 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: LTR TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY PCP USA. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 08/21/21 @ 5:05PM AT 5237 BAY VIEW RD, KELLER, TX 76244 BY PCP USA. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCITATION: BRADLEY, BRENDAN M: Served: 08/21/2021; Returned: 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO PCP FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-03253: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PLAINTIFF'S LAW FIRM: MIDLAND CREDIT MNGNT MM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Katharine Banks