This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/26/2023 at 10:03:41 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. AURELIO BAUTISTA

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AURELIO BAUTISTA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8048

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

BAUTISTA, AURELIO

Fort Worth, TX 76116-7733

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M) ; Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2023-00316: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEmailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCITATION: BAUTISTA, AURELIO: Served: 02/04/2023: Response Received: 02/24/2023; Returned: 02/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less