Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/18/2021 at 08:10:02 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Amalia Almaguer

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Amalia Almaguer. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********59-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

a foreign limited liability company

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Defendants

Almaguer, Amalia

Fort Worth, TX 76133

or wherever the Defendant may be found

Fort Worth, TX 76133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID CAVINESS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: (Amalia Almaguer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171442: Midland Credit Management, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Midland Credit Management, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCitation: Mail to PCP 4/15/2021; Almaguer, Amalia: Served: 04/20/2021; Returned: 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a Foreign Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID CAVINESS