This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/13/2022 at 22:09:51 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. ALEX M GALEAS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEX M GALEAS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5780

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

GALEAS, ALEX M

Arlington, TX 76001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Caviness

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/ LOP; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: EMAILED TO PLTF // MLD TO DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketProposed Order: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: Motion to dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2022
  • DocketEmailed: LOP NOTICE TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2022
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE: 503.1 & 508.3 AND PROVIDE THE PROPER DOCUMENTS OR REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/ 60 Day; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED ORDER TO PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: 106@pcpusa.net

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCITATION: GALEAS, ALEX M: Served: 03/16/2022; Returned: 03/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-00596: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)//efiling@pcpusa.net

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID CAVINESS