Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/15/2021 at 09:56:44 (UTC).

Michelle Krause vs April Diana McElhannon

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Michelle Krause filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against April Diana McElhannon. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********85-3

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Krause, Michelle

Defendant

McElhannon, April Diana

Watauga, TX 76148

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James R. Baudhuin

Defendant Attorney

Wesley M. Hightower

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-172221: McElhannon, April Diana: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant McElhannon, April Diana; Total Financial Assessment: 40.00; Total Payments and Credits: 40.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketObjection Index # 8: to Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Use Discovery Against Defendant Pursuant to Tex.R.Civ.P. 193.7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171050: Krause, Michelle: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Krause, Michelle; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCitation: hold for atty pick up - picked up 4/6/2021; McElhannon, April Diana: Served: 04/14/2021; Returned: 04/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R. Baudhuin