This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 08:42:34 (UTC).

Michael Cutaia, Renee Cutaia vs Perry Marcell, Jesse Ray

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Michael Cutaia, Renee Cutaia filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Perry Marcell, Jesse Ray. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********50-3

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cutaia, Michael

Overland, KS 66221

Cutaia, Renee

Overland, KS 66221

Defendants

Marcell, Perry

Grand Prairie, TX 75054

or wherever Defendant may be found

Ray, Jesse

Grand Prairie, TX 75054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

L Marc-Charles Girling

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-181026: Cutaia, Michael: (16.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCitation: mail to attorney Q.C. Completed 4/25/22 CKG; Marcell, Perry: Unserved ; Ray, Jesse: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketLetter Requesting Alias Citation Index # 5:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Perry Marcell - Original Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: Jesse Ray - Original Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCitation: Served by Constable PCT#7; Marcell, Perry: Returned Unserved 11/04/2021; Returned: 11/04/2021; Ray, Jesse: Returned Unserved 11/04/2021; Returned: 11/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177139: Cutaia, Michael: (450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cutaia, Michael; Total Financial Assessment: 466.00; Total Payments and Credits: 466.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer L Marc-Charles Girling