Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:01:21 (UTC).

Michael A. Medina vs Deborah C. Dewey

Case Summary

On 02/13/2017 Michael A Medina filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Deborah C Dewey. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********79-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Medina, Michael A.

Defendant

Dewey, Deborah C.

North Richland Hills, TX 76182

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron C Spahr

Defendant Attorney

Greg S Hargrove

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2017
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Jury Fee Payment Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Citation: Mail to Attorney; Dewey, Deborah C.: Served: 03/07/2017; Returned: 03/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2: Jury Demand, Rule 193.7, Request for Disclosure and Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119134: Medina, Michael A.: (293.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Medina, Michael A.; Total Financial Assessment: 293.00; Total Payments and Credits: 293.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 293.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greg S Hargrove