Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/22/2021 at 07:41:14 (UTC).

Mary J Henderson vs. Mark Henderson AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Mary J Henderson filed an Other lawsuit against Mark Henderson AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9830

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henderson, Mary J

Arlington, TX 76013

Defendant

Henderson, Mark

Arlington, TX 76013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francis X. Lazatin, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-02890: Henderson, Mary J: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: Henderson, Mark: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Service: Request for Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment; Awarded To: Mary Henderson; Awarded Against: Mark Henderson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketVacate Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMailed default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEmailed: RECEIPT AND ZOOM NOTC TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-01914: Henderson, Mary J: (123.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Henderson, Mary J; Total Financial Assessment: 278.50; Total Payments and Credits: 278.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 123.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Plaintiff: ON EFILED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: C02; Henderson, Mark: Served: 04/19/2021; Returned: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Original Petition for Forcible Entry and Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francis X. Lazatin, JR