This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/16/2019 at 22:57:34 (UTC).

MARINER FINANCE LLC vs. WILLIAM A KING

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 MARINER FINANCE LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAM A KING. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Hayes, Matt and Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9900

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Hayes, Matt

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINER FINANCE LLC

4101 South Cooper St Ste 109

Arlington, TX 76015

Defendant

KING, WILLIAM A

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Judgment of $3,723.28; Awarded To: MARINER FINANCE LLC; Awarded Against: WILLIAM KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued and Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment Granted: POST ANSWER DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR PLTF $3723.28 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial: (1:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerSanders, Kenneth D) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Comments: SET FOR TRIAL 90 DAYS PER JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Pre-Trial Hearing: (8:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) : Result: Set for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Comments: PER JUDGE, CASE CONTINUED, DEFN APPEARED, SICK, REQUESTED CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Pre-Trial Hearing: (8:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) : Result: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • CITATION: C08; KING, WILLIAM A: Served: 10/04/2018; Returned: 10/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP7-2019-02473: MARINER FINANCE LLC: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Transaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP7-2018-07447: MARINER FINANCE LLC: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff MARINER FINANCE LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 126.00; Total Payments and Credits: 126.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less