This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/21/2019 at 00:11:00 (UTC).

MARINER FINANCE LLC vs. ANTHONY J CEASER

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 MARINER FINANCE LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTHONY J CEASER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Hayes, Matt and Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9899

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Hayes, Matt

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINER FINANCE LLC

4101 South Cooper St Ste 109

Arlington, TX 76015

Defendant

CEASER, ANTHONY J

Dallas, TX 75240

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Judgment of $4,109.34; Awarded To: MARINER FINANCE LLC; Awarded Against: ANTHONY CEASER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued and Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Comments: UPDATED ADDRESS FOR DEFN PER INFO ON ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment Granted: POST ANSWER DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR PLTF $4109.34 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial: (1:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerSanders, Kenneth D) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Comments: SET FOR TRIAL 90 DAYS PER JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Pre-Trial Hearing: (9:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) : Result: Set for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Mailed Citation to Constable/Sheriff - Out of County Service: CONSTABLE BEN ADAMCIK, 10056 MARSH LN, SUITE 230, DALLAS, TX 75229, 214-904-3160

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • CITATION: FNS; CEASER, ANTHONY J: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP7-2019-02471: MARINER FINANCE LLC: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Transaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2018-07444: MARINER FINANCE LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff MARINER FINANCE LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 51.00; Total Payments and Credits: 51.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less