Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/11/2021 at 08:09:02 (UTC).

Maria Bigress, Individually, and a/n/f to L.S., a minor vs Bryan and Kim Andrews and Texas Aina Real Estate, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 Maria Bigress, Individually, and a/n/f to L S , a minor filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bryan and Kim Andrews and Texas Aina Real Estate, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********19-2

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bigress, Maria

Defendants

Texas Aina Real Estate, LLC

8551 San Joaquin Tr

Fort Worth, TX 76118

Andrews, Kim

North Richland Hills, TX 76118

b/s its Registered Agent, David Kopt

Fort Worth, TX 76118

Andrews, Bryan

North Richland Hills, TX 76118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JULIE WOLF

Defendant Attorneys

Christina Defiore Stone

Bruce L. Mansfield

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing Affidavit Index # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice to Take Deposition Index # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 16: Attorney Vacation Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery Index # 12: COWD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 11: for Atty Christina D Stone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice to Take Deposition Index # 10: Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery Index # 9: CWD

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 7: for Atty Christine Stone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 6: (Texas Aina Real Estate LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 5: Return of Service - Bryan Andrews

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Return of Service - (Texas Aina Real Estate LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: Return of Service - (Kim Andrews)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-168366: Bigress, Maria: (266.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Bigress, Maria; Total Financial Assessment: 266.00; Total Payments and Credits: 266.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCitation: mailed to atty 01/07; Andrews, Bryan: Served: 02/25/2021; Returned: 03/01/2021; Andrews, Kim: Served: 02/22/2021; Returned: 02/24/2021; Texas Aina Real Estate, LLC: Served: 02/22/2021; Returned: 02/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JULIE WOLF