This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/04/2018 at 04:13:42 (UTC).

MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC. vs TROUPE EYECARE, LLC and AMANDA TROUPE

Case Summary

On 02/07/2018 MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TROUPE EYECARE, LLC and AMANDA TROUPE. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********09-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC.

Defendants

TROUPE EYECARE, LLC

TROUPE, AMANDA

b/s United States Corporation Agents, Inc., registered agent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sean S. V. Homrig

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketPaper Returned Doc ID#4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCitation: Assured Civil; TROUPE EYECARE, LLC: Served: 02/14/2018; Returned: 03/20/2018; TROUPE, AMANDA: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition Doc ID#2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition Doc ID#1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-130122: MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC.: (276.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 276.00; Total Payments and Credits: 276.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 276.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less