Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/09/2017 at 18:58:57 (UTC).

Mac Churchill, Inc., d/b/a Mac Churchill Acura vs Teighan Williams and Darwin Mayo

Case Summary

On 12/02/2016 Mac Churchill, Inc , d/b/a Mac Churchill Acura filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Teighan Williams and Darwin Mayo. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********04-3

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

d/b/a Mac Churchill Acura

Mac Churchill, Inc.

Defendants

Williams, Teighan

Arlington, TX 76017-0520

Mayo, Darwin

Arlington, TX 76017-0520

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R. Douglas Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2017
  • Defendant's Pro Se Answer Copy Pltf Doc ID# 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 7: Incorrect Service Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 6: Incorrect Service Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Order for Rule 106 Doc ID# 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Motion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Doc ID# 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Citation: mailed to atty; Williams, Teighan: Served: 01/12/2017; Returned: 01/24/2017; Mayo, Darwin: Served: 01/12/2017; Returned: 01/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 2: and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117061: Mac Churchill, Inc.: (279.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Mac Churchill, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 279.00; Total Payments and Credits: 279.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 279.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer R. Douglas Scott