Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/04/2021 at 14:09:09 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Zahra Mehrabkhani

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Zahra Mehrabkhani. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1655

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Mehrabkhani, Zahra

Arlington, TX 76006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Anshul Munjal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketEmailed: DISMISSAL TO PLTF ATTY, MAILED TO DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketEmailed: HEARING NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY, MAILED TO DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: DEFN DAUGHTER CALLED. WILL FILE ANSWER BY EMAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2020-02726: Lvnv Funding Llc: (47.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 47.00; Total Payments and Credits: 47.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 47.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued: MAILED TO ABC: 633 YESLER WAY SEATTLE WA 98104-9729

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCITATION: Mehrabkhani, Zahra: Served: 08/01/2020; Returned: 08/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Anshul Munjal