Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/26/2021 at 04:01:55 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Taliib Meyers

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Taliib Meyers. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8060

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Meyers, Taliib

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacob Misemer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/Inactive Letter Sent: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) : ATTY TO CONTACT CT//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketLetter Sent to Pltf Due to Case Inactivity: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEmailed: LAW OFFICE OF PLTF ATTY/REQUEST TO CONTACT THE CT AT EARLIEST CONVENIENCE/CT CANNOT PROCEED WITH CITN UNTIL CONTACT INFO FOR ATTY IS UPDATED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCalled Plaintiff's Attorney on this Case: LEFT VM TO RETURN CALL TO CT REGARDING STATE BAR UPDATE//CTN CANNOT BE ISSUED UNTIL STATE BAR HAS BEEN UPDATED AND UPDATE HAS BEEN ENTERED INTO ODYSSEY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCourt Notes: ATTY LOCATED N ODYSSEY BUT CONTACT INFO NOT AVAIL DUE TO STATE BAR NOT BEING UPDATED FOR ATTY/CITN CANNOT BE ISSUED UNTIL ATTY INFO IN AVAIL AND CORRECTED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCalled Plaintiff's Attorney on this Case: LEFT VMAIL TO RTN CALL TO CT//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-01983: Lvnv Funding Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant