This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/20/2023 at 20:02:18 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Shawnece Kendall

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Shawnece Kendall. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9546

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Kendall, Shawnece

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lacie Elizabeth Friday

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 4/12/23 ALT SRV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO PPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: txefile@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-1664: LVNV Funding LLC: (39.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 60.00; Total Payments and Credits: 60.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO TXEFILE@ABCLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: txefile@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less