This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/15/2020 at 21:29:12 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs. ROY BYRD, JR.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LVNV FUNDING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROY BYRD, JR. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0138

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

BYRD, JR., ROY

Arlington, TX 76011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taylor Rachelle Thomas

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL W WESTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketMailed: RESET NOTICE TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Leave/Request for Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMotion for Leave/Permission for Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06133: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCITATION: BYRD, JR., ROY: Served: 12/13/2019; Returned: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less