This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/27/2023 at 21:02:42 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Ronald Beaman

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ronald Beaman. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9548

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Beaman, Ronald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lacie Elizabeth Friday

Defendant Attorney

Kerri Donnally Phillips

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : 07/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed: plaintiffs first amended petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketLetter Issued: PRE-TRIAL LTTR e-mld to both attys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer (arbitration)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 4/7/23 ALT SRV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO PPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: txefile@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-1674: LVNV Funding LLC: (37.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 58.50; Total Payments and Credits: 58.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 58.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO TXEFILE@ABCLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: txefile@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less