This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/01/2021 at 04:04:20 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Laura Denton

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Laura Denton. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9953

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Denton, Laura

Fort Worth, TX 76118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//SERVD VIA ALT SERV//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EFILED//BOTH METHODS APPROVED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: FIRST REQUEST/EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCITATION: ABC/KAC; Denton, Laura: Served: 11/18/2021; Returned: 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CIT AND PET TO ABC FOR SERVICE //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-01048: Lvnv Funding Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper