This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/20/2022 at 22:32:13 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. LATONIA GRIFFIN

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LATONIA GRIFFIN. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6889

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

4548 S. Atherton Dr. Ste. 1000

Salt Lake City, UT 84123

Defendant

GRIFFIN, LATONIA

Arlington, TX 76010-4463

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lacie Elizabeth Friday

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/ 60 Day: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED ORDER TO PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: to txefile@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • DocketCITATION: GRIFFIN, LATONIA: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO REQUESTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-04198: LVNV FUNDING LLC: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: to txefile@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lacie Friday