Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/07/2017 at 00:52:06 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. KEMEL RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 04/02/2012 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against KEMEL RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3760

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, KEMEL

Fort Worth, TX 76111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONICA SCHULZ ORLANDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2012
  • Motion for Non-Suit Filed: CASE ALREADY DISMISSED.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Court's Motion: MLD COPY TO BOTH PARTIES.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • Letter Issued: INACTIVE LTR DUE TO BANKRUPTCY MLD TO PLTF//DISM 09/24/12.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Mediation; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Bankruptcy; 06/08/2012; Reset by Court to 06/15/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • Notice: OF BANKRUPTCY FILED//KEMEL RODRIGUEZ.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • Bankruptcy Notice Filed: FOR DEFN//PTM CANCEL.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • Letter Issued: DUE TO JUDGE UNAVAILABLE//PTM RESET TO 6/15/12 AT 8:30AM//MLD NOTICES TO BOTH PARTIES.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Letter Issued: PRE TRL MEDIATION SET FOR 06/08/12 AT 8:30AM//MLD NOTICE TO BOTH PARTIES.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Answer Filed: BY DEFN.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • Answer Due On: 04/16/12; DISC DUE 05/24/12.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Comments: CITN ISSUED TO C01//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • CITATION: RODRIGUEZ, KEMEL: Served: 04/04/2012; Returned: 04/04/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP1-2012-01328: R J BOUDREAU & ASSOCIATES LLC: (106.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Transaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 106.00; Total Payments and Credits: 106.00; Balance Due as of 03/06/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica Schulz Orlando