This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/11/2022 at 03:07:09 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. KANEISHA PARSONS

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KANEISHA PARSONS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7330

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

PARSONS, KANEISHA

Arlington, TX 76010-4446

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyla Nicole Baxter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/ LOP: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketProposed Order: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF/PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF PROCEDURE 503.1 AND 508.3 AND SEND THE CORRECT DOCUMENTS OR REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCITATION: PARSONS, KANEISHA: Served: 07/16/2022; Returned: 07/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-05634: LVNV FUNDING LLC: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: to javitchcourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyla Baxter