This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/13/2022 at 09:06:55 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Juan Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Juan Rodriguez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6345

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Rodriguez, Juan

Hurst, TX 76053

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEmailed: DENIAL ALTERNATE SERVICE TO PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketOrder Denying Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketMotion Filed: Citations Returned Unexecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Rodriguez, Juan: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2022-04799: Lvnv Funding Llc: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper