This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/11/2021 at 19:30:20 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Jeanette Salcido

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeanette Salcido. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5861

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Salcido, Jeanette

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rhoda Appiah-Boateng

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed: ALT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Salcido, Jeanette: Served: 10/05/2021; Returned: 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-06602: Lvnv Funding Llc: (50.25)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 50.25; Total Payments and Credits: 50.25; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 50.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer APPIAH-BOATENG RHODA