This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/08/2021 at 05:51:31 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Iram Khan

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Iram Khan. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9031

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Khan, Iram

Fort Worth, TX 76111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: EMAIL TO PLTF ATTY//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: W/O PREJ/EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCover Letter Filed: EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Khan, Iram: Returned Unserved 08/02/2021; Returned: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-03615: Lvnv Funding Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper