This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/20/2022 at 22:31:14 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. GLORIA THOMAS

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GLORIA THOMAS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5148

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

THOMAS, GLORIA

Arlington, TX 76017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCITATION: THOMAS, GLORIA: Served: 01/06/2022; Returned: 01/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-09249: LVNV FUNDING LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper