Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/17/2018 at 08:26:25 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Elida Gonzales

Case Summary

On 10/03/2017 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Elida Gonzales. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6266

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Gonzales, Elida

Fort Worth, TX 76164

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brittany Brantley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2018
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • CANCELED: DWOP Hearing; (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Order of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: COPIES MLD TO ALL PARTIES//NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proposed Order: ORDER // VIA EFILE // JA//NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Notice: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE // VIA EFILE // JA//NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Notice: MAILED TO PLTF ON DWOP HRG SET FOR 04/06/18 // JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; For Tracking Purposes Only; 11/27/2017; Reset by Court to 12/22/2017; 12/22/2017; Reset by Court to 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Order to Retain Granted: 6O DAYS//COPIES MLD TO PLTF'S ATTY//NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Proposed Order: EFILE AP//NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Motion to Retain Filed: EFILE AP//WILL PRESENT TO JUDGE//NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Letter Sent to Pltf Due to Case Inactivity: TO PLTF ATTNY AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Answer Due On: AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Affidavit/Proof of Service Filed: EFILED// LR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • CITATION: HOLD FOR ABC LEGAL//DE; Gonzales, Elida: Served: 10/10/2017; Returned: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Cover Letter Filed: EFILE AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Case Information Sheet filed: EFILE AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • EFile Original Petition Document: AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2017-04409: LVNV Funding LLC: (47.25)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 47.25; Total Payments and Credits: 47.25; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 47.25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany N Brantley