Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/26/2021 at 19:00:19 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Eleana Dawn Clapp

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eleana Dawn Clapp. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4561

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Clapp, Eleana Dawn

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter knapp

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Clapp, Eleana Dawn: Returned Unserved 04/20/2021; Returned: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-02591: Lvnv Funding Llc: (51.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 51.50; Total Payments and Credits: 51.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 51.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter knapp