This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/10/2021 at 13:05:53 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Edward Gonzalez, JR

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Edward Gonzalez, JR. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5578

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Gonzalez, Edward, JR

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEmailed: order to pltf's atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEmailed: EMAILED 10 DAY LETTER TO P ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket10 Day Letter Mailed to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - "Unable to Locate":

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-5211: LVNV Funding LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Gonzalez, Edward, JR: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper