Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/26/2021 at 19:00:48 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Diane Wise

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Diane Wise. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4569

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Wise, Diane

Fort Worth, TX 76133-7515

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saundra Ann Mchone Meyer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Wise, Diane: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: JAVITCHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-02603: Lvnv Funding Llc: (47.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 47.50; Total Payments and Credits: 47.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 47.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saundra Ann Mchone Meyer