This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/21/2022 at 23:04:07 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. DEVIN BURNS

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEVIN BURNS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5149

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

BURNS, DEVIN

Arlington, TX 76018

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEmailed: NOTICE OF NJT TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: LEWANNAMCNEAL@YAHOO.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUnrelated Case Party Contacted Court: MOTHER OF DEFN APPEARED ASKING WHAT DOES SHE NEED TO DO. WAS INFORMED HER SON CAN FILE AN ANSWER ON LINE. PER MOTHER DEFN IS IN COLLEGE OUT OF STATE AND YOUNGER BROTHER WAS SERVED. MOTHER WAS GIVEN LEGAL AID INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCITATION: BURNS, DEVIN: Served: 01/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-09250: LVNV FUNDING LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper