This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/07/2020 at 08:26:05 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs. COURTNEY SHULTZ

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LVNV FUNDING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COURTNEY SHULTZ. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0133

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

SHULTZ, COURTNEY

Arlington, TX 76013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID E KIRKENDALL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Clerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Letter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • CITATION: SHULTZ, COURTNEY: Served: 12/14/2019; Returned: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Citation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06133: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff LVNV FUNDING, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.